RI S0767 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every school district/local education agency/city/town to report each fiscal year relating to funding/ administrative/program information from the American Rescue plan, elementary/secondary school emergency relief, and state/local recovery funds.
Title
The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/19/2023) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |