RI S0762 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-02 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Middletown Municipal Court to impose fines not exceeding one thousand dollars ($1,000).
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - General powers (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |