RI S0741 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a contractor to submit an affirmative action and equal employment opportunity plan or program prior to the award of any contract.
Title
Affirmative Action Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0741.pdf |