RI S0727 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Solid Waste
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Solid Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0727.pdf |