RI S0713 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a judge or magistrate to grant a hardship license immediately upon the finding or admission of guilt to driving under the influence or refusal to submit to a chemical test, subject to a finding of need.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Motor vehicle offenses approval of amendment lc 001646/2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2015) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2015) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |