RI S0699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Pet shops shall provide records to DEM including breeder info, health cert., license and inspection information for each dog or cat offered for sale.
Title
Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub B |
2019-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |