RI S0657 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any agreement whereby an advanced practice registered nurse is restricted in the right to practice in a certain geographic area, assist or provide treatment or establish a professional relationship with any other employer.
Title
Nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2023) |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2023) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |