RI S0652 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-19 - Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends several sections relative to the eligibility and award process for projects that receive financial assistance from PACE (Property Assessment Clean Energy) programs and the Rhode Island infrastructure bank.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Approval of amendment (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (09/14/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |