RI S0635 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school committees from entering into a school bus service contract unless the contract provides for payments to school bus drivers, monitors and aids for one hundred and eighty (180) days or the length of the contracted for school year.
Title
Student Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Education |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/19/2021) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |