RI S0634 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the director of the department of transportation to organize and complete snow removal from all sidewalks located on state highway overpasses and pedestrian overhead walkways within 24 hours of a snowstorm.
Title
Sidewalks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0634.pdf |