RI S0605 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows those individuals with prior convictions for possession with intent to deliver or crimes of violence, to be eligible for the drug court program in Superior Court.
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Courts - superior court (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Courts - superior court (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-01 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |