RI S0603 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes amendments providing for additional reporting duties and requirements for persons with knowledge of mistreatment or neglect of elders.
Title
Abuse In Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |