RI S0596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for specific fines and sanctions to operators of motor vehicles who fail to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a vulnerable road user causing injury, serious injury, or death to the vulnerable road user.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0596.pdf |