RI S0588 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides another method for municipalities to identify and calculate private residences as low and moderate income housing.
Title
Low And Moderate Income Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0588.pdf |