RI S0585 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires road and bridge contractors for the department of transportation to furnish a bond equal to at least 50% of the contract price on contracts in excess of one hundred and fifty thousand dollars ($150,000).
Title
Contractors' Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-05-31 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |