RI S0571 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits state vendors from making political contributions to candidates for the office responsible for awarding those state vendor contracts.
Title
Reporting Of Political Contributions By State Vendors
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0571.pdf |