RI S0562 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Rhode Island office of energy resources, in consultation with the building commission to promulgate rules and regulations to create a statewide solar photovoltaic permit application.
Title
Statewide Municipal Solar Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/03/2017) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |