RI S0557 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Name the portion of the Blackstone River Bike path within the city of Woonsocket the Albert P. Valliere Bike Path.
Title
Albert P. Valliere Bike Path
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0557.pdf |