RI S0487 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the secretary of health and human services to implement changes under the Rhode Island Medicaid reform act.
Title
Relating To The Medicaid Reform Act Of 2008
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0487.pdf |