RI S0485 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives) (proposes An Amendment To The Constitution To The Electors Of The State That Increases The Length Of Term For Senators And Representatives To Four (4) Years And Would Impose A Limit Of Four (4) Consecutive Terms For Those Offices.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives) (proposes An Amendment To The Constitution To The Electors Of The State That Increases The Length Of Term For Senators And Representatives To Four (4) Years And Would Impose A Limit Of Four (4) Consecutive Terms For Those Offices.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0485.pdf |