RI S0475 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Health Care Services--utilization Review Act: would authorize an attending physician to designate a qualified provider to provide information to the utilization agent
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Health Care Services--utilization Review Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0475.pdf |