RI S0453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation of state funds to cities and towns who are members of NBMTF for maintenance of boats servicing Narragansett Bay.
Title
Payments To Fire Companies
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0453.pdf |