RI S0445 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Expressing Deepest Condolences On The Passing Of Antonio P. Trebisacci, Jr.
Title
Senate Resolution Expressing Deepest Condolences On The Passing Of Antonio P. Trebisacci, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/02/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0445.pdf |