RI S0427 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies Warren need not perform update until 2019, and every three years thereafter until revaluation in 2025.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |