RI S0416 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits obtaining/purchasing/transferring a firearm on behalf of another person if other person prohibited from possessing firearm with increase in penalties for those offenses and applications amended to state number of firearms purchased.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |