RI S0415 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provision declaring prisoners serving a life sentence civilly dead.
Title
Correctional Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0415.pdf |