RI S0392 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a condominium association to impose a fee of up to one hundred twenty-five dollars ($125) for preparation of a resale certificate.
Title
Condominium Law -- Resale Of Units
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-10 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |