RI S0384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an honorary name to a portion of highway on Chopmist Hill Road from Route 44 in Chepachet to Route 6 in Scituate, now known a Hartford Pike, as the Gold Star Family Highway.
Title
The Gold Star Family Highway
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - The gold star family highway approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - The gold star family highway approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |