RI S0370 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services - Abused And Neglected Children (would Require That When A Child Is In Dcyf Custody Before Their School System Can Be Changed, Their Medical And Academic Records Must Be Provided To The New School System First.)
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services - Abused And Neglected Children (would Require That When A Child Is In Dcyf Custody Before Their School System Can Be Changed, Their Medical And Academic Records Must Be Provided To The New School System First.)
Sponsors
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0370.pdf |