RI S0355 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals several criminal offenses pertaining to three (3) bridges, including the Crawford Street Bridge, the Apponaug River Bridge, and the Pawtuxet Falls Bridge.
Title
Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0355.pdf |