RI S0325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation -- Imaging Services Surcharge: excludes mammography services form the surcharge imposed on net patient revenue of service providers of imaging services
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation -- Imaging Services Surcharge
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Committee continued | |
2011-06-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-05-11 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-09 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0325.pdf |