RI S0294 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Rhode Island commerce corporation to develop a combat veterans' small business loan program.
Title
Rhode Island Commerce Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0294.pdf |