RI S0279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from sales tax any amount a construction contractor charges clients for materials and supplies in connection with a construction contract.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0279.pdf |