RI S0263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services --the Rhode Island Works Program (would Allow A Family To Qualify For Low-income Child Care Assistance For The Time An Adult Member Of The Family Is Participating In Education Or Training, Provided That The Adult Is Working At Least 20 Hours Per Week, And Such Child Care Is Necessary.)
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services --the Rhode Island Works Program (would Allow A Family To Qualify For Low-income Child Care Assistance For The Time An Adult Member Of The Family Is Participating In Education Or Training, Provided That The Adult Is Working At Least 20 Hours Per Week, And Such Child Care Is Necessary.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0263.pdf |