RI S0235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires nonprofit dental service plan providers to provide notice of any changes relating to coverage to all plan purchasers purchasing dental services for employees under a group or individual policy contract or health benefit plan.
Title
Nonprofit Dental Service Corporations
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0235.pdf |