RI S0222 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies the Home Rule Charter amendments adopted and approved by the electors of North Smithfield on November 6, 2018.
Title
Relating To The Town Of North Smithfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |