RI S0207 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Parking Facilities And Privileges: would repeal the requirement that police departments and other state departments report about disability parking to the governor's commission on disabilities
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Parking Facilities And Privileges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-04-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0207.pdf |