RI S0204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that electrical distribution companies submit a time of use rate plan to the PUC setting forth high and on-demand times. The time of use rate plans are to be implemented on or before January 1, 2022.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0204.pdf |