RI S0191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provisions of the general laws allowing deferred deposit providers, also known as "payday lenders."
Title
Small Loan Lenders
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee heard |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (04/09/2019) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0191.pdf |