RI S0166 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, sale, and distribution of residential upholstered children's products that contain certain amounts of bromide or chlorine bonded to carbon that is added to a plastic, foam, or textile.
Title
Child Products And Upholstered Furniture
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-03 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |