RI S0159 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes $25,000 of eligible military retirement income paid by state federal government to persons 60 years or older effective 2022 from state income tax.
Title
Personal Income Tax - Military Retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0159.pdf |