RI S0158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the Barrington town council to appoint two alternate members to the planning board.
Title
Local Planning Board Or Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/10/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/08/2017) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |