RI S0102 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a health insurer from denying a claim for any medical bill based on sole reasoning that the bill may arise from a motor vehicle accident or other third-party claim and prohibits a medical provider from refusing to submit medical for same reason.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline -- Prompt Processing Of Insurance Claims
Sponsors
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0102.pdf |