RI S0102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the real and tangible personal property of The Providence Community Health Centers, a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in Providence, Rhode Island, on the list of properties exempt from taxation.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation -- Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2021) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2021) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |