RI S0097 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities From April 30, 2020, And Its Expiration Date To July 30, 2020.)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities (would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Veteran And Military Spouse Education & Employment Opportunities From April 30, 2020, And Its Expiration Date To July 30, 2020.)
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |