RI S0061 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Meeting postponed (02/11/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Meeting postponed (02/11/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts a portion of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) model act with respect to receiverships, specifically with regards to how derivative contracts are treated in cases of insurance receiverships.
Title
Insurers' Rehabilitation And Liquidation Act -- Insurance Receivership Model Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/11/2021) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0061.pdf |