RI S0055 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that sex offenders register their presence with any homeless shelter at which they may temporarily stay and provides that said shelters notify the local law enforcement agency of the presence.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Sexual offender registration and notification (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Sexual offender registration and notification (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-28 | House | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-28 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2017) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |