RI S0034 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students in public schools to possess and use sunscreen without a physician's note or prescription, if the product is regulated by the FDA for over-the-counter use.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |