RI S0029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the juror's fees for each day's attendance on the superior court from $15.00 per day to $25.00 per day commencing July 1, 2020, and increase to $35.00 per day commencing July 1, 2021 and thereafter.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |