RI H8369 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove the existing probate court appellate requirement that an appellant file with the superior court all relevant probate court filings, exhibits and transcripts.
Title
Appeals
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |